Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 03/07/2007
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 03/07/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/27/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/29/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/29/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/29/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/29/2007
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 03/29/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/17/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/17/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/17/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/17/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/17/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/17/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/17/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/17/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/17/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/18/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 04/18/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 04/18/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/18/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/18/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 04/23/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/23/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/02/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/02/2007
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/02/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/02/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/02/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/02/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/15/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/15/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/15/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/22/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/23/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/20/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/20/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 07/16/2008