There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Child Support Protection Act of 2007

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To repeal a provision enacted to end Federal matching of State spending of child support incentive payments.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/07/2007Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
03/14/2007Referred to the Subcommittee on Income Security and Family Support.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
03/07/2007Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/07/2007Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (90)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 03/07/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 03/07/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/07/2007
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 03/07/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/07/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 03/07/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 03/07/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 03/07/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 03/07/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 03/07/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/21/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/21/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/21/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/21/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 03/27/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/17/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/17/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 04/17/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/18/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/18/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/23/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/23/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/15/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/15/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/15/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 05/15/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/22/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/22/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/20/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/20/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 08/02/2007
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 08/02/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 08/02/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 08/02/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 08/03/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/07/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/07/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/07/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/10/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 09/10/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/10/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/17/2007
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 09/17/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 09/17/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/20/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/20/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 09/20/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/04/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 10/04/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 10/04/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/04/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/04/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 10/04/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 10/23/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/23/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 10/23/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 10/23/2007
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 10/23/2007
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 12/04/2007
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 12/04/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 12/04/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 12/04/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 12/06/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 12/06/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 12/06/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 12/06/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 12/06/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 12/13/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 12/13/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 12/18/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 01/15/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 01/16/2008
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 01/16/2008
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 01/23/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 01/28/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/06/2008
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 02/06/2008
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/06/2008
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 02/14/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 02/14/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 03/11/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/11/2008
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/03/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/03/2008
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 04/09/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 04/30/2008
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/08/2008
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 06/23/2008
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/09/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/18/2008

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means03/07/2007 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Income Security and Family Support03/14/2007 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1386. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/07/2007)

Child Support Protection Act of 2007 - Amends the Deficit Reduction Act of 2005 to repeal a provision that prohibited federal matching funds to a state for expenditures from federal amounts paid to the state for child support and establishment of paternity to carry out an agreement for services of the Federal Parent Locator Service.