Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 03/07/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 03/07/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/07/2007
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 03/07/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/07/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 03/07/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 03/07/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 03/07/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 03/07/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 03/07/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/21/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/21/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/21/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/21/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 03/27/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/17/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/17/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 04/17/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/18/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/18/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/23/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/23/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/15/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/15/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/15/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 05/15/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/22/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/22/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/20/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/20/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 08/02/2007
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 08/02/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 08/02/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 08/02/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 08/03/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/07/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/07/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/07/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/10/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 09/10/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/10/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/17/2007
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 09/17/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 09/17/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/20/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/20/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 09/20/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/04/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 10/04/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 10/04/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/04/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/04/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 10/04/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 10/23/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/23/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 10/23/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 10/23/2007
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 10/23/2007
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 12/04/2007
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 12/04/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 12/04/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 12/04/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 12/06/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 12/06/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 12/06/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 12/06/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 12/06/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 12/13/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 12/13/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 12/18/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 01/15/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 01/16/2008
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 01/16/2008
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 01/23/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 01/28/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/06/2008
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 02/06/2008
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/06/2008
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 02/14/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 02/14/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 03/11/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/11/2008
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/03/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/03/2008
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 04/09/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 04/30/2008
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/08/2008
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 06/23/2008
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/09/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/18/2008