Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/07/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 03/07/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/07/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 03/07/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 03/07/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/08/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/09/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 03/09/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/13/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/13/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/23/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/26/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/26/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/27/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/28/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/28/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/29/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/16/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/16/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/16/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 04/16/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/16/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/16/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/16/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 04/18/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/18/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/19/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/20/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/01/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/01/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/01/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/07/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/07/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/07/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/07/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/15/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/16/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/17/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/05/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/10/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/23/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/31/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 11/09/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 01/16/2008