Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 03/07/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/26/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/27/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/22/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/22/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/23/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/05/2008
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 07/30/2008