Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 01/05/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 01/12/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 01/16/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 01/16/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 01/16/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 01/16/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 01/17/2007
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 01/17/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 01/17/2007
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 01/17/2007
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 01/17/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 01/17/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 01/17/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 01/17/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 01/17/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 01/17/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 01/18/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 01/18/2007
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 01/18/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 01/18/2007
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 01/18/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 01/18/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 01/18/2007
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 01/19/2007
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 01/22/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 01/22/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 01/22/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 01/22/2007
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 01/22/2007
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 01/23/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 01/23/2007
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 01/31/2007
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 06/05/2007