Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/28/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/28/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/19/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 04/26/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 05/09/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 12/13/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 01/17/2008