Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 03/08/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 03/08/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 03/08/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/20/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 03/20/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/20/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/20/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/29/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 03/29/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/29/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 03/29/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/29/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 04/19/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/19/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/19/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/19/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 04/19/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/19/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 04/19/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 04/26/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/26/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/03/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/03/2007
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 05/10/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/10/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/10/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/10/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/10/2007
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 05/10/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/10/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/10/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/17/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/17/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/24/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/24/2007
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 05/24/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/07/2007
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 06/15/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/15/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 06/15/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/22/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/28/2007
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 06/28/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/28/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 07/12/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/12/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 07/12/2007
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 07/12/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 07/12/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 07/12/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/19/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/19/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 07/19/2007
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/26/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 07/26/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 07/26/2007
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 07/26/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/26/2007
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 08/03/2007
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 08/03/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/06/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 09/06/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/06/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/06/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/06/2007
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 09/06/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/06/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 09/14/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/14/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 09/20/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/27/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 10/04/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 10/04/2007
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 10/15/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 10/15/2007
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 10/15/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 10/18/2007
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 10/18/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 10/25/2007
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 11/01/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 11/08/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 12/06/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 12/06/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 12/06/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 12/06/2007
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 12/06/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 12/19/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 01/17/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 01/29/2008
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 02/14/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/15/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/28/2008
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 02/28/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/06/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/06/2008
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/14/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 03/14/2008
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/03/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/03/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/03/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 04/17/2008
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 04/17/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/17/2008
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 04/24/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/24/2008
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 04/24/2008
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 05/01/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/01/2008
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 05/22/2008
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/17/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 07/17/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/31/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/11/2008
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/25/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 09/29/2008

Show cosponsors who withdrew