Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/26/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/26/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/23/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 04/25/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/25/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/01/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/02/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/02/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/14/2007
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 05/14/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/17/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/17/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/21/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/21/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/21/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 05/23/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/23/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/24/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 06/06/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/06/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/07/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/07/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/07/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/07/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 06/12/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/14/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/14/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 06/14/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 06/19/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 06/25/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/25/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/28/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/28/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/28/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/28/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/11/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/11/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/11/2007
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 07/11/2007
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 07/11/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 07/11/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/16/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/16/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/18/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/24/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/24/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 07/26/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/26/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/26/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/26/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/30/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/30/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/31/2007
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 07/31/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 07/31/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 07/31/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 08/01/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 08/01/2007
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 08/03/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 08/03/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/05/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/05/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/05/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/19/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/19/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 09/24/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/25/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/26/2007
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 09/26/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/26/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/27/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/02/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 10/02/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/03/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/03/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 10/10/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 10/10/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 10/16/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 10/16/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/16/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 10/18/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 10/23/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/23/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 10/25/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 11/01/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/01/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 11/01/2007
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 11/06/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 11/06/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 11/15/2007
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 11/15/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 12/05/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 01/15/2008
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/14/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/14/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/28/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/03/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 03/31/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 04/22/2008
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 04/22/2008
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 04/24/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 05/01/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/22/2008
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/29/2008