Committees: H.R.1424 — 110th Congress (2007-2008)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce03/09/2007 Referred to
10/16/2007 Markup by
03/04/2008 Reported by H. Rept. 110-374,Part 3
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health03/12/2007 Referred to
06/15/2007 Hearings by
10/10/2007 Markup by
10/10/2007 Reported by
House Education and Labor03/09/2007 Referred to
07/18/2007 Markup by
10/15/2007 Reported by H. Rept. 110-374,Part 1
House Education and Labor Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions06/27/2007 Referred to
House Ways and Means03/09/2007 Referred to
09/26/2007 Markup by
10/15/2007 Reported by H. Rept. 110-374,Part 2
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health03/14/2007 Referred to
09/19/2007 Markup by
09/19/2007 Reported by