Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 03/09/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 03/09/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/20/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/08/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/17/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/22/2007
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/06/2007
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 06/12/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 08/01/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 12/04/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 02/26/2008