Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 03/09/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 03/09/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 03/12/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/12/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/12/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/12/2007
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 03/12/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/13/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/13/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/13/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/14/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/14/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/14/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/19/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/19/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/19/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 03/19/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/21/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/21/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 03/21/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/29/2007
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 03/29/2007
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 04/24/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/24/2007
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 04/24/2007
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 05/02/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 05/02/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/02/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 05/08/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 05/08/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 05/10/2007
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 05/23/2007
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 05/23/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/06/2007
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 06/06/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/22/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/26/2007
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/26/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 07/11/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 03/14/2008