Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 03/20/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/16/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/19/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 04/25/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/21/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 02/12/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/14/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/26/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 02/26/2008
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 02/26/2008
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 03/13/2008
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/08/2008
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 04/17/2008
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 04/23/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/29/2008
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/01/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/01/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/01/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/01/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/22/2008
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 06/12/2008
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 06/17/2008
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/17/2008