There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 896 Pittsburgh Street in Springdale, Pennsylvania, as the "Rachel Carson Post Office Building".


Actions Overview (7)

Date
08/09/2007Became Public Law No: 110-62. (TXT | PDF)
08/09/2007Signed by President.
08/06/2007Presented to President.
08/03/2007Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S10978-10979)
08/01/2007Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Lieberman without amendment. Without written report.
04/23/2007Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 334 - 53, 3 Present (Roll no. 246).(text: CR H3733)
03/09/2007Introduced in House

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber
08/09/2007Became Public Law No: 110-62. (TXT | PDF)
08/09/2007Signed by President.
08/06/2007HousePresented to President.
08/04/2007SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
08/03/2007SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S10978-10979)
08/01/2007SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 305.
08/01/2007SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Lieberman without amendment. Without written report.
08/01/2007SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
06/06/2007SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs referred to Subcommittee on Federal Financial Management, Government Information, Federal Services, and International Security.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs
04/24/2007SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
04/23/2007-7:12pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 334 - 53, 3 Present (Roll no. 246). (text: CR H3733)
04/23/2007-7:12pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/23/2007-7:03pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3742)
04/23/2007-3:03pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
04/23/2007-2:42pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1434.
04/23/2007-2:42pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3733-3735)
04/23/2007-2:41pmHouseMr. Davis (IL) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
03/29/2007HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
03/29/2007HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
03/09/2007HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
03/09/2007HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (40)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 03/09/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 03/26/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/26/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/26/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/26/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/26/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/26/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/26/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/29/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/29/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/29/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/29/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/29/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/29/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/29/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/29/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/16/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/16/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/16/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/16/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/20/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/20/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 04/20/2007

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform03/09/2007 Referred to
03/29/2007 Markup by
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs04/24/2007 Referred to
08/01/2007 Markup by
08/01/2007 Reported by
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs Subcommittee on Federal Financial Management, Government Information, Federal Services, and International Security06/06/2007 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1434.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.1434. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 110-62 (08/09/2007)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 896 Pittsburgh Street in Springdale, Pennsylvania, as the "Rachel Carson Post Office Building."