Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 03/09/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 03/26/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/26/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/26/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/26/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/26/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/26/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/26/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/29/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/29/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/29/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/29/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/29/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/29/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/29/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/29/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/16/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/16/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/16/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/16/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/20/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/20/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 04/20/2007