Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/14/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/14/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/14/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 03/19/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/19/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/19/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/19/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 03/20/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/20/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/20/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/20/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/20/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/20/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 03/20/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/21/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 03/21/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/21/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/21/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/26/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 03/26/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/26/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/27/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 03/27/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 03/27/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/27/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/27/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/27/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 03/29/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/29/2007
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/29/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/19/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 04/19/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 04/23/2007
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 04/24/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/02/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/11/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/11/2007