Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 02/16/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/27/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/27/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/01/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/06/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/07/2007
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 03/07/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/07/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/09/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 03/19/2007
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 03/26/2007
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 07/29/2008