Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/29/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 03/29/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/18/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/25/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 04/25/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/25/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/01/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/01/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/01/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/01/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/01/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 05/01/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/02/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 05/03/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/07/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/07/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/15/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/17/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/17/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/22/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/24/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/24/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/05/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/05/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/05/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/07/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/12/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/12/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/11/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/11/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/23/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/23/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 08/01/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/05/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/10/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 12/04/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/04/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 12/11/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/14/2008