Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/29/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/29/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/29/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/29/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 03/29/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/18/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/18/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 04/18/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 04/18/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/18/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/18/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/18/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 04/18/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 04/18/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/18/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/18/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/19/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/19/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/02/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/02/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/02/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/02/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/02/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/02/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/02/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/02/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/02/2007
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/02/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/10/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/10/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/10/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 05/10/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/10/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/10/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/10/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/24/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/05/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/07/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/07/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/15/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 06/15/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/22/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/22/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/22/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/22/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/22/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/22/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/22/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/26/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/26/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/28/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/28/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/28/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/28/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/28/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/10/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/10/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/12/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 07/16/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/18/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 07/19/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 07/30/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 08/03/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/04/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/04/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/04/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/04/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/06/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/10/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/10/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 09/10/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/19/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/19/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/19/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/19/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/03/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 10/03/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 10/03/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 10/25/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 11/15/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 01/15/2008
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 01/15/2008
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 01/15/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/11/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 04/01/2008