Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 03/12/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/23/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/23/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 03/23/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/23/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/23/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/23/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/23/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/23/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/23/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/23/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/23/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/23/2007
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/26/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/26/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 03/26/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/26/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/26/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/26/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/27/2007
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 03/28/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/28/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/28/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 03/30/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/30/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/30/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/16/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/16/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/16/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/16/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/16/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/16/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/20/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/20/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 04/20/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 05/01/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/01/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/01/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/08/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/08/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/08/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/08/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/08/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/08/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/08/2007