Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/19/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/19/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/19/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 04/19/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 04/23/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/08/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/08/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/16/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/16/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 05/21/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 05/21/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/21/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/21/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/21/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/22/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/23/2007