Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 03/13/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/15/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/19/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/21/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/21/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 03/23/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/23/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/23/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/23/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/27/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/27/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/17/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/17/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/17/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/17/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/17/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/17/2007
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 04/18/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/09/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/14/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/05/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/05/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/05/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/07/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/16/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/07/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/07/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/17/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/17/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 09/26/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 10/03/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 10/15/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 10/17/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 10/17/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 10/22/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 10/22/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/22/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 10/23/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 10/23/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 10/25/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 10/25/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/01/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 11/07/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 11/07/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 11/07/2007
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 11/08/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 11/08/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 11/08/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 11/14/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 11/15/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 12/04/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 12/04/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 12/04/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 12/05/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 12/05/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 12/11/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 12/11/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 12/18/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 12/19/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 01/17/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/29/2008
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 02/07/2008
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 02/26/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 02/26/2008
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 04/02/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/02/2008