Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/13/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/29/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/29/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 03/29/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/29/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/29/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/29/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 03/29/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/29/2007
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 04/16/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/16/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/16/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/16/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 05/15/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/15/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 05/15/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/15/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/15/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 05/15/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/15/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/15/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/06/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/06/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/06/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/06/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/06/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/17/2007
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 07/17/2007
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 07/17/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/27/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/18/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/31/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 11/15/2007
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 12/05/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/10/2008