Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 03/14/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 03/14/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 03/14/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 03/14/2007
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 03/14/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/28/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/28/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/28/2007
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/28/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/28/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/28/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/28/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/28/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/28/2007
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 04/18/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/18/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/18/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 04/18/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/18/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/24/2007
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/24/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 04/24/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/24/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/24/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/24/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 04/26/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/26/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/26/2007
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 05/02/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 05/02/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 05/02/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 05/02/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/02/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/02/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/10/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/10/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/10/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/10/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/17/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 05/17/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/17/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/24/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/24/2007
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 06/05/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 06/05/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/05/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/11/2007
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 06/11/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 06/12/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 06/22/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/26/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 06/27/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 06/28/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/10/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/11/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 07/11/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/11/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 07/16/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/18/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/18/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/19/2007
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 07/24/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/26/2007
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 07/26/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/26/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 07/26/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 08/01/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 09/05/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/05/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 09/05/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/14/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 09/17/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/17/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 09/24/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/25/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/26/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 09/26/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/01/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 10/02/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 10/25/2007
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 11/01/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 11/08/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 11/08/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 12/13/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 12/17/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/04/2008
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 03/31/2008
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 03/31/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/08/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/08/2008
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 05/06/2008
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/06/2008
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/20/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/08/2008