Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 03/14/2007
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/27/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/27/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 03/27/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/27/2007
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 03/27/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/27/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 03/27/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/27/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/27/2007
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 03/27/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 03/27/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 03/27/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/27/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/27/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/27/2007
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-45] 03/27/2007
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 03/27/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 03/27/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/27/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/27/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 03/27/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/27/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 03/27/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 03/27/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 03/27/2007
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/27/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/27/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/27/2007
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 03/27/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/27/2007
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 03/27/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/27/2007
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 03/27/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/27/2007
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/27/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/27/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 03/27/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 03/27/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/27/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/27/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/27/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/27/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/27/2007
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 03/27/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/27/2007
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 03/27/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/16/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 04/16/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 04/16/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/16/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 04/16/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/16/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/16/2007
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 04/16/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 04/16/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/19/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/19/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/19/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/08/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/08/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 10/10/2007