Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 03/14/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 03/14/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/23/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/23/2007
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/26/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/29/2007
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 03/29/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/29/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/17/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/17/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/17/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 04/17/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/17/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/17/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/17/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/17/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 04/19/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/19/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/19/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 04/25/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/25/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/25/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/25/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/25/2007
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 04/25/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/02/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/10/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/10/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/16/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/16/2007
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 05/16/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/16/2007
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 05/16/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/16/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/21/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/21/2007
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 05/21/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 05/21/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/21/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/12/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 06/12/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 06/12/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 06/12/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/12/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 06/12/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/13/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/26/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/26/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 06/26/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 07/11/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/11/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/11/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/19/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/19/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/07/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/10/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/20/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 10/09/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/22/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 10/22/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/22/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 10/22/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/22/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/22/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/22/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 10/29/2007
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 10/29/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/05/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/05/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 11/07/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 11/15/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/15/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 12/04/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 12/04/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 12/04/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 12/04/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 12/12/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 01/23/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/26/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/04/2008
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/11/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/11/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/02/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/02/2008
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/02/2008
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/02/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/02/2008
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/02/2008
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 04/03/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/15/2008
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 04/15/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 04/15/2008
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/15/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 04/15/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 04/16/2008
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/30/2008
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 05/06/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 05/07/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/13/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/21/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/04/2008
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/24/2008
Rep. Cazayoux, Donald J., Jr. [D-LA-6] 07/14/2008
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 07/16/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/09/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 09/09/2008
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 09/09/2008
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 09/10/2008
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 09/17/2008
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/29/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 11/19/2008