Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 03/14/2007
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5]* 03/14/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/14/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 03/14/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 03/14/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/07/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/22/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/27/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 10/15/2007