Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/19/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/19/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/21/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/23/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/23/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/17/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/17/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/17/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/26/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/26/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/26/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/07/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/07/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/09/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/09/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/15/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/15/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/15/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/17/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/05/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/05/2007
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/13/2007
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/13/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/22/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/22/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/22/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 06/22/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/22/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/28/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/28/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 07/11/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/11/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 07/17/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 08/03/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 08/03/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 09/05/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/18/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/27/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/22/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/14/2008
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/14/2008
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 02/14/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 03/03/2008
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/03/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/05/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/16/2008
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 04/16/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/01/2008
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/06/2008
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/13/2008
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 05/20/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/03/2008
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/10/2008
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 06/12/2008
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 07/15/2008
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 07/23/2008