Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/18/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/01/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/09/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/06/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/06/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 06/12/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/12/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/17/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/24/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/25/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 07/25/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/20/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/27/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/29/2007