Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/15/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/16/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/16/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 04/16/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/16/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/16/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/16/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/16/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/16/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 04/16/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/16/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/16/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/16/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/16/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/16/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/16/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/16/2007
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 04/16/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/16/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/16/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/16/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 04/16/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/16/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/16/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/16/2007
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 04/16/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/16/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/16/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/16/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 04/16/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 04/16/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/16/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/16/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 04/16/2007
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 04/16/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/16/2007
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 04/18/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/18/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/18/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/18/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/18/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 04/18/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 04/20/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/20/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/20/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/20/2007
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 04/25/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/25/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 04/25/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 04/25/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 04/26/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/26/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 05/01/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/01/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 05/01/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/01/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/01/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 05/02/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/02/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/02/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/02/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/08/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 05/08/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/08/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/08/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/08/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/08/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/08/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/08/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 05/10/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/10/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/15/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/16/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/16/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/16/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/17/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/17/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/21/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/21/2007
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 05/21/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/21/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 05/24/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/06/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/06/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/06/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/06/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 06/07/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 06/07/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/13/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 06/13/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/15/2007
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 06/15/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 06/19/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/22/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/22/2007
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/22/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/27/2007
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 06/27/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/27/2007
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 06/28/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 06/28/2007
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/28/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 06/28/2007
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 07/11/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 07/11/2007
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 07/12/2007
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 07/12/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/19/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 07/30/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 08/01/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 08/03/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 09/04/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 09/04/2007
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 09/05/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 09/06/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/10/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/17/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/19/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 10/02/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/03/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 10/04/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 10/09/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 10/09/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 10/10/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 10/16/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/25/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 11/13/2007
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 12/11/2007
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 12/13/2007
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 12/17/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 12/19/2007
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 02/13/2008
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 02/27/2008
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 02/27/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/06/2008
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/06/2008
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/14/2008
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 04/23/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/18/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 07/30/2008