There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

A PLUS Act
Academic Partnerships Lead Us to Success Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To allow a State to submit a declaration of intent to the Secretary of Education to combine certain funds to improve the academic achievement of students.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/15/2007Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
06/27/2007Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
Action By: Committee on Education and Labor
03/15/2007Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/15/2007Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (66)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 03/15/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/21/2007
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/21/2007
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 03/22/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/22/2007
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 03/27/2007
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 03/27/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/29/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/02/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/08/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/30/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 07/30/2007
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 09/04/2007
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 10/09/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 02/13/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/03/2008

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and Labor03/15/2007 Referred to
House Education and Labor Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education06/27/2007 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1539.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1539. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/15/2007)

Academic Partnerships Lead Us to Success Act or the A PLUS Act - Allows each state to submit to the Secretary of Education a declaration of intent, applicable for up to five years, permitting it to receive federal funds on a consolidated basis that would otherwise be directed toward specific programs furthering the stated purpose of title I (Improving the Academic Achievement of the Disadvantaged) of the Elementary and Secondary Education Act of 1965.

Requires each declaration to be formulated by a combination of specified State Authorizing Officials or by referendum, and list the programs for which consolidated funding is requested. Allows states to use such funds for any educational purpose permitted by state law, but requires states to make certain assurances that they will use fiscal control and fund accounting procedures, abide by federal civil rights laws, and advance educational opportunities for the disadvantaged. Allows states to amend their declarations.

Requires each declaration state to: (1) inform the public of its student achievement assessment system and annually report on student progress toward the state's proficiency standards, disaggregating performance data by specified student groups; and (2) keep aggregate spending on elementary and secondary education at no less than 90% of such spending for the school year coinciding with this Act's enactment.

Limits administrative expenses.

Requires consolidated funds to be distributed in a manner that allows for the equitable, as determined by each state, participation of private schools.