Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 02/08/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 03/27/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/17/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/19/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 04/26/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/26/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/09/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/09/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/09/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/15/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/15/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 06/05/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/05/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/05/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/05/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/05/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/13/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 06/13/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/28/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/17/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 07/17/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/17/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 08/03/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 08/03/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/18/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 10/09/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 12/18/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 01/23/2008
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 02/06/2008
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/22/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/22/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/29/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/01/2008
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/06/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/06/2008
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/07/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/08/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/13/2008
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 05/13/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/13/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/14/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/14/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/15/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/15/2008
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/15/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/15/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/15/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/15/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/15/2008
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/15/2008
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/15/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/20/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/20/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/20/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/20/2008
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/21/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/21/2008
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/21/2008
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/21/2008
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/21/2008
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 05/22/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/22/2008
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/03/2008
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/03/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/05/2008
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 06/05/2008
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/05/2008
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/05/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/10/2008
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/10/2008
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 06/10/2008
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/10/2008
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 06/10/2008
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 06/10/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/12/2008
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/19/2008
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/19/2008
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 06/19/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/19/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/25/2008
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 06/25/2008
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/25/2008
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 06/25/2008
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/25/2008
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/09/2008
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/10/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 07/23/2008
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/23/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/24/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/29/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/29/2008
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 07/29/2008
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/29/2008
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 09/09/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/16/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/24/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/24/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/26/2008
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 09/26/2008
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 09/26/2008
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-45] 09/27/2008
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/29/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 10/02/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/19/2008