Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/15/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/15/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 03/19/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/19/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/19/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/19/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/19/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 03/27/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/27/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/27/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/27/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/27/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/27/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/27/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/27/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 03/28/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/28/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/29/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/01/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/01/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/01/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/17/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/17/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/24/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/05/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/11/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/12/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/22/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/22/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 06/22/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/22/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/10/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 07/10/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/12/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/12/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/17/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/17/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/17/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/26/2007
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 07/26/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 08/02/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 08/02/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 08/03/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/06/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/06/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/06/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 09/27/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 11/08/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/08/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 11/08/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/08/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 11/15/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 11/15/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 11/15/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/15/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 12/04/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 12/04/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 12/04/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 12/04/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/04/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 12/04/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 12/04/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 12/10/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 12/10/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 12/18/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 12/19/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 12/19/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 12/19/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 01/23/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 01/23/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/12/2008
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/12/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/12/2008
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 03/12/2008
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 03/12/2008
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/12/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/16/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/29/2008
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/30/2008
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 05/05/2008
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/22/2008
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 06/04/2008
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/23/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/23/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/23/2008
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 07/23/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/23/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/23/2008
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 07/23/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/23/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/23/2008
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/30/2008
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/30/2008
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 09/15/2008
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 09/15/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/15/2008