Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/21/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/26/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/26/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/29/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/18/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/24/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 04/24/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 05/03/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/03/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 05/23/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/27/2007