Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 01/29/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 02/05/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/05/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/05/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 02/05/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/06/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 02/06/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/06/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/06/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/12/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/12/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 02/14/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/14/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/14/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/15/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/01/2007
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/01/2007
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 03/01/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 04/16/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/17/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/17/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 04/17/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 05/16/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/16/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/24/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 06/06/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/18/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/18/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 06/21/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 06/21/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/28/2007