Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 01/09/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 01/11/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/16/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/06/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/06/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/03/2007