Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 03/22/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/22/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 03/22/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/22/2007
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/22/2007
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 03/22/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/22/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 03/22/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/22/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 03/22/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/22/2007
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 03/22/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/22/2007
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 03/22/2007
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/22/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/22/2007
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 03/22/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 03/22/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/22/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/22/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 03/22/2007
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 03/22/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 03/22/2007
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 03/22/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 03/22/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/22/2007
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 03/22/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/22/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/22/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 03/22/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/22/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 03/22/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 03/22/2007
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 03/22/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/22/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 03/22/2007
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 03/22/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 03/26/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 03/26/2007
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/26/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 03/26/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/26/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 03/26/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 03/26/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/26/2007
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 03/26/2007
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 03/26/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 03/26/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/26/2007
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 03/26/2007
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 03/29/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/29/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 03/29/2007
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 03/29/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 03/29/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/29/2007
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/29/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 03/29/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/29/2007
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 03/29/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 03/29/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/29/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/29/2007
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/29/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 04/17/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/17/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/17/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 04/17/2007
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 05/01/2007
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 05/02/2007
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 05/07/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/10/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/21/2007
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 05/21/2007
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 06/15/2007
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 06/26/2007
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 08/04/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 09/04/2007
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 09/04/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 09/04/2007
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 09/04/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 09/04/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/04/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/04/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/04/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 09/24/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/24/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/24/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/24/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 10/16/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 10/16/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 10/16/2007
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 02/25/2008
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/01/2008