Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/28/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 04/16/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 04/16/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/16/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 04/16/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 04/16/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 04/16/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/17/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/18/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 04/18/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 04/18/2007
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 04/18/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/18/2007
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 04/18/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/18/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 04/18/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/18/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/19/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 04/19/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/19/2007
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 04/19/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/19/2007
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 04/19/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/19/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/01/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/01/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/01/2007
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/01/2007
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 05/01/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/01/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/01/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/01/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/01/2007
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 05/03/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 05/03/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/07/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/07/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 05/09/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/09/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/14/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/14/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/14/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 05/14/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/14/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/17/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/17/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/23/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/24/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/24/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/24/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 06/05/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/05/2007
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/07/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/12/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/14/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/19/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/19/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/19/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/20/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/20/2007
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 06/22/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 06/22/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/27/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 06/27/2007
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 07/11/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 07/11/2007
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 07/31/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/31/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 08/03/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 08/03/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 10/03/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/09/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/09/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/09/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 10/09/2007
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 10/22/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 10/25/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 10/25/2007
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 10/25/2007
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 11/01/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 01/15/2008
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 01/15/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 01/23/2008
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 01/29/2008
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 02/06/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 02/06/2008
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 02/12/2008
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 02/26/2008
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 02/26/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/26/2008
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 02/28/2008
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/31/2008
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/02/2008
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/10/2008
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 04/10/2008
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 04/10/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/10/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 04/10/2008
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 04/10/2008
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 04/22/2008
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 04/22/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/01/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 05/01/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/01/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/01/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/07/2008
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 05/07/2008
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/07/2008
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 05/14/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/15/2008
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/12/2008
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/19/2008
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 07/09/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/14/2008
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 07/14/2008
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 07/15/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/15/2008
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/15/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 07/22/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 07/22/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 07/23/2008
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 07/23/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 07/23/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/24/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 07/28/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/29/2008