Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/27/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/16/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/16/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/16/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/16/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/16/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/16/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/16/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/16/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 04/16/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 04/16/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/16/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/16/2007
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 04/16/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 04/16/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/16/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/16/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/16/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/16/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/16/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/16/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/16/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/16/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 04/16/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 04/16/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/16/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/16/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/16/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/16/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 04/16/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/16/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 04/16/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/16/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/16/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/16/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/16/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 04/16/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/16/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/16/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/16/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/16/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/16/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/16/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/16/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/16/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/16/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/16/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/16/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/16/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/16/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/16/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/16/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/16/2007
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 04/16/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/16/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/19/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/19/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/19/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 04/19/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/19/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 04/19/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/19/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/19/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/19/2007
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 04/19/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/19/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/19/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 04/19/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 04/19/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 04/19/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/19/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/19/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 04/19/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/19/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 04/25/2007
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/25/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/25/2007
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 05/07/2007

Show cosponsors who withdrew