Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 03/21/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/21/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/22/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/22/2007
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 03/22/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/26/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/26/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/26/2007
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 03/26/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 03/26/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 03/26/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/26/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/26/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/26/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 03/26/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/26/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/26/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/26/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/26/2007
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 03/30/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 04/19/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/07/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/07/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/07/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/07/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/07/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/07/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/07/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/07/2007
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 05/07/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/07/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/07/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/07/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/07/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 05/07/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/07/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/07/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/07/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/07/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/07/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/07/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 05/07/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/07/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/07/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/07/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/07/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 05/07/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 05/07/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/07/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/07/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/07/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/07/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/07/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/07/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/07/2007