There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Revolutionary War and War of 1812 Battlefield Protection Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Revolutionary War and War of 1812 Battlefield Protection Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the American Battlefield Protection Act of 1996 to establish a battlefield acquisition grant program for the acquisition and protection of nationally significant battlefields and associated sites of the Revolutionary War and the War of 1812, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
09/24/2008Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR 9/22/2008 H8491-8492)
07/29/2008Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 110-796.
01/04/2007Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
10/02/2008SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
09/25/2008SenateReceived in the Senate.
09/24/2008-8:57pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/24/2008-8:57pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR 9/22/2008 H8491-8492)
09/24/2008-8:57pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H9406)
09/22/2008-1:03pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Young (AK) objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
09/22/2008-12:53pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 160.
09/22/2008-12:53pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8491-8493)
09/22/2008-12:53pmHouseMs. Bordallo moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/29/2008HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 514.
07/29/2008HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 110-796.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
07/16/2008HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
07/16/2008HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
07/16/2008HouseSubcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
07/10/2008HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands
02/07/2007HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
01/04/2007HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
01/04/2007HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources01/04/2007 Referred to
07/16/2008 Markup by
07/29/2008 Reported by H. Rept. 110-796
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands02/07/2007 Referred to
07/10/2008 Hearings by
07/16/2008 Discharged from
Senate Energy and Natural Resources10/02/2008 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.160.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.160. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (09/24/2008)

Revolutionary War and War of 1812 Battlefield Protection Act - Amends the American Battlefield Protection Act of 1996 to direct the Secretary of the Interior, acting through the American Battlefield Protection Program, to establish an acquisition grant program for battlefields and associated sites identified in the Report to Congress on the Historic Preservation of Revolutionary War and War of 1812 Sites in the United States (battlefield report).

Authorizes the Secretary to provide grants to states or local governments (eligible entities) to pay the federal share of the cost of acquiring fee-simple or lesser interests from willing sellers in such sites. Permits eligible entities to acquire an interest in eligible sites using such grants in partnership with nonprofit organizations.

Requires the non-federal share of the cost of acquisition of eligible sites to be not less than 50 percent of the total.

Subjects acquired property to the Land and Water Conservation Fund Act's prohibition against conversion to other than public outdoor recreation uses without the Secretary's approval.

Requires the Secretary to submit to Congress a report on activities carried out under this Act and an update of the battlefield report.

Authorizes appropriations to: (1) provide grants under the Program for FY2009 through FY2013; and (2) update the battlefield report.