Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 03/20/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/20/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 03/20/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 03/20/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 03/20/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 03/20/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/22/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 03/22/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/22/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/22/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 03/23/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/23/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/23/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 03/23/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/23/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 03/23/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 03/27/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/27/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/27/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 03/27/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/17/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/17/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 04/17/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 04/17/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/17/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/17/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/17/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/17/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/25/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/02/2007
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 05/02/2007
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 05/02/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 05/02/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/02/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/08/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/08/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 05/08/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/08/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/09/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/09/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/09/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 05/09/2007
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 05/09/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/09/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/15/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/15/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/15/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/17/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 05/17/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/17/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/21/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 05/21/2007
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/23/2007
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 05/23/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/23/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 05/23/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/23/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/06/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 06/06/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/06/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/14/2008