Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/09/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/31/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/22/2008
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/29/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/05/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/06/2008
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/07/2008
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 05/13/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/21/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/22/2008
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 06/03/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/03/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 06/03/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/09/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/09/2008
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/09/2008
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 06/12/2008
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/17/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/17/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/17/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/18/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/08/2008
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 07/09/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/09/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/15/2008
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/16/2008
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 07/17/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/22/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/29/2008
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/29/2008
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/30/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/30/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/30/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/30/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/31/2008
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/02/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/19/2008