Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 01/04/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/12/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 01/12/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 01/12/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 01/12/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 01/12/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 01/18/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 01/18/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 01/22/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/05/2007