Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 03/20/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 03/27/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 03/27/2007
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 03/27/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/27/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/27/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/29/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 06/12/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/18/2007