Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 03/20/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/02/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/02/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/02/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/02/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/02/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/02/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/02/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/02/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/02/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/02/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/02/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/02/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/02/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/02/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/02/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/02/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/02/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/02/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/23/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/23/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/23/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/23/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/23/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/23/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/24/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 05/24/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/24/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/24/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/05/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/05/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/05/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/05/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 06/05/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/05/2007
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/05/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 06/05/2007
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/05/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/12/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/12/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/12/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 06/12/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 06/12/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/12/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/12/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/15/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/15/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/15/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/21/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/21/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/21/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 12/06/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 12/06/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 12/13/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/23/2008