Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 03/29/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/20/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/20/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/20/2007
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 04/24/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/24/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/03/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 05/03/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 05/15/2007
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 09/15/2008
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 09/18/2008