Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 03/21/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 03/21/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 03/21/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 03/21/2007
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 03/21/2007
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 04/19/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 04/19/2007
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 04/23/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 05/03/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/03/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/08/2007
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 10/01/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 10/02/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 10/02/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 10/02/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 10/02/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 10/03/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 10/03/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 10/03/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 10/03/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 10/04/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 10/04/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/10/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 10/15/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 10/18/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 10/18/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 10/22/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 10/22/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/22/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 10/29/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 11/05/2007
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 11/05/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/06/2008
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 04/02/2008
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/08/2008
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 04/08/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/08/2008
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 04/24/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/29/2008
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/13/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 05/13/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/09/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/08/2008
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 07/08/2008
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 07/08/2008
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 07/22/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/23/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/23/2008
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 07/23/2008
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 07/23/2008
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/23/2008

Show cosponsors who withdrew