Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 04/23/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/23/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/23/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/24/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/01/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/15/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/22/2007