Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 03/21/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 06/25/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 06/27/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/27/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 07/11/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/11/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 07/11/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 07/16/2007
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 07/16/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/16/2007